This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/03/2020 at 21:41:56 (UTC).

IN RE: SHEEHAN, BRUCE E

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 IN RE SHEEHAN, BRUCE E was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-02

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court

BEA, DANAYS

Decedent

SHEEHAN, BRUCE E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Mark J Labate

 

Court Documents

Will

06/11/2020 - Will

Letters of Administration

05/29/2020 - Letters of Administration

Order Authorizing Opening Safe Dep Box

04/21/2020 - Order Authorizing Opening Safe Dep Box

Petition to Open Safe Deposit Box

04/17/2020 - Petition to Open Safe Deposit Box

Letters of Administration

04/09/2020 - Letters of Administration

Order Admitting Will to Probate

04/09/2020 - Order Admitting Will to Probate

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Proof of Publication; Event Type: Event; Comments: 5/29/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Will; Book/Page: 31968:720; Event Type: Event; Comments: 3 PGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certified Copy Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certified Copy Request; Event Type: Event; Comments: 1 CC AMENDED LETTERS OF ADMIN , 1 CC ORDER DESIGNATING DEPOSITORY TO MARK J LABATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letters of Administration; Book/Page: 31951:3523; Event Type: Event; Comments: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Designating Depository; Event Type: Event; Comments: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO AMEND LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Authorizing Opening Safe Dep Box; Book/Page: 31909:4448; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition to Open Safe Deposit Box; Book/Page: 31907:1918; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pending Will; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DANAYS BEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Heirs; Event Type: Event; Comments: DANAYS BEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Death Certificate - Copy; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Last Will and Testament - Copy; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Oath of Personal Representative; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3450027AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:MARK J LABATE 2744 E COMMERCIAL BLVD FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33308-4113 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3400-PROBATE CP FILING1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition for Administration; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less