This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/13/2021 at 19:08:47 (UTC).

IN RE: NIEBLES, BRENDA M

Case Summary

On 05/04/2020 IN RE NIEBLES, BRENDA M was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-02

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Niebles, Alvaro A

Decedent

Niebles, Brenda M

Not Classified By Court

NIEBLES, ALVARO ALFREDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Brunet, Leon A.

 

Court Documents

Petition for Administration

05/04/2020 - Petition for Administration

Oath of Personal Representative

05/06/2020 - Oath of Personal Representative

Letters of Administration

05/27/2020 - Letters of Administration

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Appointment; Hearing Code: SPECAPPT; Hearing Time: 11:55AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Appointment; Hearing Code: SPECAPPT; Hearing Time: 11:55AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON MOTION FOR ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION & DIRECTING PAYMENT TO STEPHANIE RAMIREZ ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Appointment; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION FOR ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION AND DIRECTING PAYMENT TO STEPHANIE RAMIREZ AND ANTHONY RAMIREZ FROM THE RESTRICTED DEPOSITORY ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Appointment; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION FOR ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION AND DIRECTING PAYMENT TO STEPHANIE RAMIREZ AND ANTHONY RAMIREZ FROM THE RESTRICTED DEPOSITORY ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Satisfaction and Release of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: FPL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: SET VIA ZOOM 8/10/2021 AT 11:55 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Checklists and Certification; Event Type: Event; Comments: DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verified Statement as to Creditors; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: SATISFACTION OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DECLARATION OF LEON A. BRUNET RE: FILING OF DEATH CERT OF DECEDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Heirs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Death Certificate - Copy; Event Type: Event; Comments: BRENDA MARION NIEBLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Waiver of Priority & Consent to Appointment of Personal Rep; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Inventory Filed; Event Type: Event; Comments: VERIFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Oath of Personal Representative; Book/Page: 31927:958; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND DESIGNATION ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2430011AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:BRUNET, LEON A. LEON A. BRUNET PA 2151 S LE JEUNE ROAD SUITE 301 CORAL GABLES FL 33134-4535 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3400-PROBATE CP FILING1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:05/06/2020 REGISTER#:243CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition for Administration; Book/Page: 31924:2749; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRUNET, LEON A