This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 12/08/2019 at 08:23:53 (UTC).

IN RE: NAVA, GIORGIO

Case Summary

On 09/24/2019 IN RE NAVA, GIORGIO was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-02

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bacci, Crisitna

Decedent

Nava, Giorgio

Not Classified By Court

BACCI, CRISTINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Brunet, Leon A.

 

Court Documents

Petition for Administration

09/24/2019 - Petition for Administration

Oath of Personal Representative

09/25/2019 - Oath of Personal Representative

Letters of Administration

09/26/2019 - Letters of Administration

Letters of Administration

09/27/2019 - Letters of Administration

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Publication; Event Type: Event; Comments: 11/27/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Publication; Event Type: Event; Comments: 11/27/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCopy of; Event Type: Event; Comments: CLAIM MAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOrder Authorizing Sale of Real Property; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON EMERGC AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketClaim Filed Against Estate; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM FPL $67.73

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketAmended Petition; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR AUTHORIZATION TO SELL REAL PROPERTY HELD BY THE ESTATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketPetition for Order Designating Depository; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketInventory Filed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetters of Administration; Book/Page: 31632:3968; Event Type: Event; Comments: SUPPMTL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketDeath Certificate; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORGNL Parties: Nava Giorgio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketCertificate; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketOrder Appoint Personal Rep $; Event Type: Event; Comments: DP, NB Parties: BACCI CRISTINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetters of Administration; Book/Page: 31630:2435; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOath of Personal Representative; Book/Page: 31632:376; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3510022AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:BRUNET, LEON A. LEON A. BRUNET PA 2151 S LE JEUNE ROAD SUITE 301 CORAL GABLES FL 33134-4535 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3400-PROBATE CP FILING1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Administration; Book/Page: 31627:4746; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketPetition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketCivil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRUNET, LEON A