This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/03/2019 at 12:05:34 (UTC).

IN RE: FERNANDEZ, DELFINA P

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 IN RE FERNANDEZ, DELFINA P was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-02

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court

Fernandez, Juan M

Decedent

FERNANDEZ, DELFINA P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Chevallier, Gina R.

 

Court Documents

Letters of Administration

02/21/2019 - Letters of Administration

Oath of Personal Representative

02/08/2019 - Oath of Personal Representative

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • Joinder, Waiver And Consent; Event Type: Event; Comments: MARLENE FERNANDEZ WELBORN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Joinder, Waiver And Consent; Event Type: Event; Comments: MARCO FERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Petition for Approval of Settlement; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Inventory of Personal Representative; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Proof of Publication; Event Type: Event; Comments: 3/14/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Affidavit of Heirs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Special Appointment; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Order Appoint Personal Rep $; Event Type: Event; Comments: NB, RESTCTD DEPOST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters of Administration; Book/Page: 31334:1302; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Order Designating Depository; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2019
  • Petition for Order Designating Depository; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Affidavit of Heirs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Affidavit of; Event Type: Event; Comments: CONCERNING CRIMINAL HISTORYFROM JUAN MARCOS FERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Email Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Notice of Confidential Info Within Court Filing Accepted; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Death Certificate - Copy; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Petition for Administration; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Hearing Info: Special Appointment; Hearing Code: SPECAPPT; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less