This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 02/05/2020 at 22:56:45 (UTC).

IN RE: DAVID, ERIC ANDRE JACQUES

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 IN RE DAVID, ERIC ANDRE JACQUES was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-02

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court

Toledo, Yanirma

Decedent

David, Eric Andre Jacques

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

Samole, Myron M

 

Court Documents

Order Authorizing Sale of Real Property

04/10/2019 - Order Authorizing Sale of Real Property

Will

02/15/2019 - Will

Order Admitting Will to Probate

02/12/2019 - Order Admitting Will to Probate

Letters of Administration

02/12/2019 - Letters of Administration

Oath of Personal Representative

01/25/2019 - Oath of Personal Representative

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketCopy of; Event Type: Event; Comments: CLAIM MAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketClaim Filed Against Estate; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM CAPITAL ON BANK (USA) NA $2,232.24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketCopy of; Event Type: Event; Comments: CLAIM MAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketClaim Filed Against Estate; Event Type: Event; Comments: CITIBANK $2,978.35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketCopy of; Event Type: Event; Comments: CLAIM MAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketClaim Filed Against Estate; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE $2,130.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketReceipt of Depository; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTING PETITION TO REIMBURSE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketReceipt of Depository; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketDeath Certificate; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORIGINAL Parties: David Eric Andre Jacques

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE AND LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3530013AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:SAMOLE, MYRON M 9700 S DIXIE HWY STE 630 MIAMI FL 33156-2825 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3400-PROBATE CP FILING1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketPetition for Order Designating Depository; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketPetition to Open Safe Deposit Box; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketPetition to Waive Bond; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOath of Personal Representative; Book/Page: 31311:4420; Event Type: Event; Comments: DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketPetition for Administration; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketPetition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less