This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/25/2021 at 16:55:10 (UTC).

IMPERIAL FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY VS BELKIS ESTHER RODRIGUEZ RUJANO ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 IMPERIAL FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against BELKIS ESTHER RODRIGUEZ RUJANO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IMPERIAL FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

RODRIGUEZ RUJANO, BELKIS ESTHER

OLAN, ALEXANDRA

JIMENEZ, ISABEL ANDREA

JIMENEZ, ANTHONY

NISSAN INFINITI LT

USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William J Mc Farlane

Defendant Attorneys

Jimenez, Carlos

Christopher W Wadsworth (esq)

Maskow, Peter J

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

10/13/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

09/25/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

09/24/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

09/24/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

09/24/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Final Judgment by Judge

09/03/2021 - Final Judgment by Judge

Stipulation

10/13/2021 - Stipulation

Notice of Filing:

10/13/2021 - Notice of Filing:

Voluntary Dismissal

10/13/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

09/25/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

09/24/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

09/24/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

09/24/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Stipulation

09/24/2021 - Stipulation

Stipulation

09/24/2021 - Stipulation

Stipulation

09/24/2021 - Stipulation

Notice of Filing:

09/24/2021 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

09/24/2021 - Notice of Filing:

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation; Event Type: Event; Comments: BETWEEN PLAINTIFF, IMPERIAL FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: JOINT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32791:2019; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: NISSAN INFINITI LT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32757:4504; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: OLAN ALEXANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32757:3133; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: JIMENEZ ANTHONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32757:2058; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: JIMENEZ ISABEL ANDREA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32757:2032; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation; Event Type: Event; Comments: JOINT STIPULATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2970065AMT PAID:$403.50NAME:WILLIAM J MC FARLANE210 N UNIVERSITY DR FL 6CORAL SPRINGS FL 33071-7394COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$2.50$2.50TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$403.50RECEIPT DATE:08/05/2021REGISTER#:297CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NISSAN INFINITI LT is a litigant

Latest cases where IMPERIAL FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jimenez, Carlos