Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/07/2019 at 08:45:34 (UTC).

IMAGEN MEDICAL CENTER VS WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 IMAGEN MEDICAL CENTER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IMAGEN MEDICAL CENTER

Defendant

WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

RIVERO, JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carla C. Martinez

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

05/07/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Memorandum of Disposition

04/30/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Order:

04/30/2019 - Order:

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

04/30/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Filing:

04/15/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Motion for Summary Judgment

04/15/2019 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Demand for Jury Trial

04/09/2019 - Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Service of Process

04/09/2019 - Notice of Service of Process

Pre Trial Summons

03/26/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Memorandum of Disposition

03/12/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Statement of Claim

01/23/2019 - Statement of Claim

Email Notice with Party

01/23/2019 - Email Notice with Party

Notice of Interrogatory

01/23/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

01/23/2019 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

01/23/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

01/23/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

01/23/2019 - Request for Admissions

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31436:4775; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: STANDING PIP SCHEDULING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: BINDING AUTHORITY...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3540032AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:CARLA C. MARTINEZ 2601 SOUTH BAYSHORE DRIVE 18TH FLOOR COCONUT GOVE FL 33133 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTEND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Email Notice with Party; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Imagen Medical Center Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Windhaven Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carla C. Martinez