This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 01/06/2020 at 02:04:59 (UTC).

IDEAL CENTER VS. STEVENSON R BETHEL ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/31/2019 IDEAL CENTER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against STEVENSON R BETHEL. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ideal Center

Defendants

Bethel, Stevenson R

One Time Restorations

Sudamar Paint & Body Shop

Not Classified By Court

Property Address

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carlos X Rodriguez

Rodriguez, Carlos X., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Issued

08/02/2019 - Writ of Possession Issued

Default Final Judgment

07/22/2019 - Default Final Judgment

Order on Motion to Strike

07/22/2019 - Order on Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike

05/08/2019 - Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike

02/25/2019 - Motion to Strike

Answer

02/05/2019 - Answer

Complaint

01/31/2019 - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: WRIT SENT WITH CK Parties: Bethel Stevenson R; Sudamar Paint & Body Shop; One Time Restorations

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketDefault Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31540:2150; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Bethel Stevenson R; Sudamar Paint & Body Shop; One Time Restorations

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Strike; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Strike; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Bethel Stevenson R; Sudamar Paint & Body Shop; One Time Restorations

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2310058AMT PAID:$215.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE3$10.00$30.00 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$245.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/31/201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketSummons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event; Comments: ONE TIME RESTORATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketSummons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event; Comments: SUDAMAR PAINT & BODY SHOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketSummons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event; Comments: STEVENSON R BETHEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Docket5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Docket5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Sudamar Paint & Body Shop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Docket5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Docket5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: One Time Restorations

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Docket5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Docket5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Bethel Stevenson R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.