Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/20/2020 at 06:31:40 (UTC).

ICONIC IMAGING, INC. VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 ICONIC IMAGING, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Iconic Imaging, Inc.

Defendant

Progressive Select Insurance Company

Assignee

Rodriguez, Daisy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Patino Law Firm

Defendant Attorney

Diane Cullinan

 

Court Documents

Motion for Extension of Time

08/16/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Extension of Time

07/12/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Response to Request for Admissions

07/10/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

07/10/2019 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Privilege Log

07/10/2019 - Privilege Log

Motion:

06/14/2019 - Motion:

Notice of Interrogatory

06/13/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Order:

03/08/2019 - Order:

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

03/08/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Motion to Strike

12/18/2019 - Motion to Strike

Notice of Filing:

11/25/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

11/25/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

11/11/2019 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Hearing-

10/21/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion:

10/12/2019 - Motion:

Request for Production

10/12/2019 - Request for Production

Motion for Sanctions

10/12/2019 - Motion for Sanctions

Notice of Hearing-

10/01/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 3:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EXECUTED JURAT PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EXECUTED JURAT PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO DEEM OBJECTIONS WAIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2019
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: Miami Beach Courtroom 2-1 1130 Washington Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2140019AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:THE PATINO LAW FIRM COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/21/2019 REGISTER#:214

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3540016AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:THE PATINO LAW FIRM COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/24/2019 REGISTER#:354

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Iconic Imaging Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant