This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/07/2023 at 00:55:11 (UTC).

HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS LUIS MORENO ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/16/2023 HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against LUIS MORENO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hsbc Bank Usa National Association

Deutsche Alt B Securities Mortgage Loan Trust

Defendants

Moreno, Luis

Capdevilla, Luis Moreno

Capdevila, Luis Moreno

Sovereigns Condominium Inc (The)

Ascendus Inc

Accion East Inc

MIAMI-DADE COUNTY A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE

Ericsson

Matos, Javier

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Collins, Sara Beth

 

Court Documents

Order:

03/27/2023 - Order:

Notice:

03/27/2023 - Notice:

Final Disposition Document

03/27/2023 - Final Disposition Document

Voluntary Dismissal

03/27/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

Service Returned

03/21/2023 - Service Returned

Service Return for Unknown Party

03/21/2023 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Return for Unknown Party

03/21/2023 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Return for Unknown Party

03/21/2023 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Returned

03/21/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

03/21/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

03/21/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

03/21/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

03/21/2023 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/27/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/27/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/27/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/27/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/27/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3210482AMT PAID:$9.00NAME:ROBYN RACHEL KATZ225 E ROBINSON ST STE 660ORLANDO FL 32801-4321COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$9.00RECEIPT DATE:03/29/2023REGISTER#:321CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DISMISSING ACTION AND RELEASING THE LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF RELEASE OF PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Disposition Document; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33640:4738; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITHOUT PREJUDICE Parties: Moreno Luis; Capdevilla Luis Moreno; Capdevila Luis Moreno; Sovereigns Condominium Inc (The); Ascendus Inc; Accion East Inc; MIAMI-DADE COUNTY A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE; Ericsson; Matos Javier

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LUIS MORENO A/K/A LUIS MORENO CAPDEVILLA A/K/A LUIS MORENO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040271AMT PAID:$917.50NAME:COLLINS, SARA BETHMCCALLA RAYMER PIERCE, LLC 225 E ROBINSON ST SUITEORLANDO FL 32801-4326COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$2.50$2.503142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$917.50RECEIPT DATE:02/18/2023REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33587:3557; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: MRSERVICE@MCCALLA.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less