This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/04/2022 at 02:37:25 (UTC).

HOUSTON SPECIALTY INS CO VS LINVILLE ALLDRE RAYMORE

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 HOUSTON SPECIALTY INS CO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LINVILLE ALLDRE RAYMORE. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Houston Specialty Ins Co

Defendant

Raymore, Linville Alldre

Not Classified By Court

P M C (LLC)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William M Lindeman

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

08/02/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

08/02/2021 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

08/13/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Summons Returned - No Service

09/13/2021 - Summons Returned - No Service

Service Returned

09/15/2021 - Service Returned

Memorandum of Disposition

09/15/2021 - Memorandum of Disposition

Motion:

09/21/2021 - Motion:

Pre Trial Summons

10/04/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Service Returned

11/02/2021 - Service Returned

Memorandum of Disposition

11/24/2021 - Memorandum of Disposition

Order Setting Non-Jury Trial

11/29/2021 - Order Setting Non-Jury Trial

Notice of Compliance

12/03/2021 - Notice of Compliance

Voluntary Dismissal

12/09/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

12/15/2021 - Order of Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 32955:353; Event Type: Event; Comments: STIP Parties: Raymore Linville Alldre

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32912:34; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Raymore Linville Alldre

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting Non-Jury Trial; Event Type: Event; Comments: 12/13/21 AT 10;15AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 1:30PM; Hearing Location: North Dade Justice Center Courtroom 2-7 15555 Biscayne Blvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Raymore Linville Alldre

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2690005AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:10/05/2021REGISTER#:269CASHIER:AT17

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: AMENDED Parties: Raymore Linville Alldre

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2550005AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:08/16/2021REGISTER#:255CASHIER:DCD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Raymore Linville Alldre

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3000289AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:WILLIAM M LINDEMANPO BOX 3506ORLANDO FL 32802-3506COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:08/03/2021REGISTER#:300CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $6201.71

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PMC (Nova Scotia) Company is a litigant

Latest cases where HOUSTON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lindeman, William M