This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/06/2023 at 12:14:26 (UTC).

HOPE MEDICAL CENTER LLC. VS STAR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 HOPE MEDICAL CENTER LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STAR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOPE MEDICAL CENTER LLC.

Assignor

CALVIS, WILFREDO

Defendant

STAR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sorensen, Jon

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/26/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/26/2023 - Complaint

Notice of Interrogatory

01/26/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

01/26/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

01/26/2023 - Request for Admissions

Email Notice:

01/26/2023 - Email Notice:

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

01/30/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Motion for Attorneys Fees

03/15/2023 - Motion for Attorneys Fees

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/06/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/24/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: STAR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100198AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:SORENSEN, JON815 N. HOMESTEAD BLVD., #511HOMESTEAD FL 33030COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:04/11/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Attorneys Fees; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3170151AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:SORENSEN, JON815 N. HOMESTEAD BLVD., #511HOMESTEAD FL 33030COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:01/28/2023REGISTER#:317CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: $15,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less