This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/24/2023 at 15:52:19 (UTC).

HOMETOWN UNIVERSITY LAKES LLC VS RUBY MARTORI ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 HOMETOWN UNIVERSITY LAKES LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RUBY MARTORI. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-05

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hometown University Lakes LLC

Not Classified By Court and Defendants

Martori, Ruby

Possession, Unknown Party in

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shawn D Arbeiter

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/30/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/30/2023 - Complaint

Service Returned

02/22/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

02/22/2023 - Service Returned

Affidavit of Non-Payment

02/22/2023 - Affidavit of Non-Payment

Non-Military Affidavit

02/22/2023 - Non-Military Affidavit

Notice of Filing:

02/22/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Motion for Final Judgment

02/22/2023 - Motion for Final Judgment

Default Final Judgment

02/28/2023 - Default Final Judgment

Certificate of Service

03/01/2023 - Certificate of Service

Motion to Vacate Judgment

03/16/2023 - Motion to Vacate Judgment

Order Vacating Judgment - Granted

03/27/2023 - Order Vacating Judgment - Granted

Certificate of Service

03/27/2023 - Certificate of Service

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Vacating Judgment; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORDER VACATING FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR MOBILE HOME TENANT EVICTION & FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Vacating Judgment - Granted; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Vacate Judgment; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Book/Page: 33610:927; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR MOBILE HOME TENANT EVICTION Parties: Martori Ruby; Possession Unknown Party in

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Final Judgment; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: COPY OF DEFENDANT'S ANSWER ( RUBY MARTORI)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2500009AMT PAID:$20.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE2$10.00$20.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:02/01/2023REGISTER#:250CASHIER:BELKISG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Martori Ruby

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Possession Unknown Party in

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150008AMT PAID:$185.00NAME:SHAWN D ARBEITER4430 SW 64TH AVEDAVIE FL 33314-3438COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$185.00RECEIPT DATE:02/01/2023REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less