*************P-26
11/09/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Miami-Dade, Florida
Hill Orthopedic Center Llc
Mendez, Yaneth
Progressive American Insurance Company
Estevez, Marisol
Barber, Cecilia Maria, ESQ
Hanks, Brent D., ESQ
11/09/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
11/09/2022 - Statement of Claim
11/09/2022 - Request for Production
11/09/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory
11/09/2022 - Request for Admissions
11/09/2022 - Notice of Appearance
11/14/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements
11/30/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
12/06/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued
12/20/2022 - Notice of Service of Process
01/04/2023 - Notice of Limited Appearance
01/10/2023 - Motion to Dismiss
01/11/2023 - Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm
DocketDocket Entry: Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Limited Appearance; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive American Insurance Company
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: Progressive American Insurance Company
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110084AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030MIAMI FL 33137-3232COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:12/06/2022REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3280409AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030MIAMI FL 33137-3232COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:11/15/2022REGISTER#:328CASHIER:EFILINGUSER
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event
[-] Read Less