Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/07/2021 at 16:09:42 (UTC).

HILL ORTHOPEDIC CENTER LLC VS FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 HILL ORTHOPEDIC CENTER LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hill Orthopedic Center Llc

Assignor

Napoleon, Marjila

Defendant

First Acceptance Insurance Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Estevez, Marisol

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph A. Wolf, Esq

William J Mc Farlane

 

Court Documents

Response to Request for Admissions

05/10/2021 - Response to Request for Admissions

Answer and Affirmative Defense

05/10/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Appearance

05/05/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Memorandum of Disposition

04/30/2021 - Memorandum of Disposition

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

04/29/2021 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Email Notice:

04/15/2021 - Email Notice:

Notice of Unavailability/absence

04/15/2021 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Service Returned

04/07/2021 - Service Returned

Pre Trial Summons

03/10/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice of Appearance

02/16/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Request for Admissions

02/16/2021 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

02/16/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

02/16/2021 - Request for Production

Statement of Claim

02/16/2021 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/16/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: William J Mc Farlane; First Acceptance Insurance Company Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 1:30PM; Hearing Location: DCC-County Courtroom 6-4 73 West Flagler Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: MIAMIPLEADINGS@PIPLAW.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: First Acceptance Insurance Company Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2050142AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/18/2021 REGISTER#:205CASHIER:FERGUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: First Acceptance Insurance Company Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2600034AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL 4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030 MIAMI FL 33137-3232 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/18/2021 REGISTER#:260CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HILL ORTHOPEDIC CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where First Acceptance Insurance Company Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Estevez, Marisol