This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/07/2020 at 21:54:58 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ, SHEILA VS HERNANDEZ, JONATHAN

Case Summary

On 10/10/2019 HERNANDEZ, SHEILA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HERNANDEZ, JONATHAN. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HERNANDEZ, SHEILA

Respondent

HERNANDEZ, JONATHAN

Minors

HERNANDEZ, ALLISON M

HERNANDEZ, MATTHEW J

HERNANDEZ, JACOB D

H, J D

H, A M

H, M J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Fabar, Laura M.

Respondent Attorney

Burgs, Robert D

 

Court Documents

EFinal Judgment by Judge

06/03/2020 - EFinal Judgment by Judge

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Uncontested Calendar; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: CHC Courtroom 20-B 175 N.W. 1st Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uncontested Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: UCD HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: EFinal Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 31957:1821; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event; Comments: 6-11-20 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RESPONDENT'S CERTIFICATE OF PARENTING CLASS (ATTACHED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: WIFE'S FINANCIAL AFFIDADVIT (ATTACHED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: HUSB'S NTC TO SET CAUSE FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: HUSB'S SECOND MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3580022AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:SICLAIT, AILEEN 4649 PONCE DE LEON BLVD STE 495 CORAL GABLES FL 33146-2114 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3339-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3510007AMT PAID:$409.00 NAME:SICLAIT, AILEEN 4649 PONCE DE LEON BLVD STE 495 CORAL GABLES FL 33146-2114 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) ESummons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.