This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/08/2023 at 14:29:14 (UTC).

HEALTHY MINDS & BODY GROUP, INC., VS INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 HEALTHY MINDS BODY GROUP, INC , filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HEALTHY MINDS & BODY GROUP, INC.,

Loyola Jimenez, Lianet

Defendant

INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Iglesia, Jose R

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/01/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

12/01/2022 - Statement of Claim

Request for Production

12/01/2022 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

12/01/2022 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

12/01/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Supplemental Request to Produce

12/01/2022 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

12/01/2022 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

12/01/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

12/05/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2430006AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$30.00RECEIPT DATE:12/29/2022REGISTER#:243CASHIER:LAURAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150328AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:IGLESIA, JOSE RLAW OFFICE OF JOSE R. IGLESIA LLC 7154 SW 47TH STRMIAMI FL 33155-4664COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:12/02/2022REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Supplemental Request to Produce; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $2,500.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Iglesia, Jose R