This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/22/2019 at 00:07:30 (UTC).

HEALTH IN MOTION, INC. VS WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 HEALTH IN MOTION, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HEALTH IN MOTION, INC.

Defendant

WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

MAYNARD, MAXALI Q'OSAHAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Assignee Attorney

Armando A Brana

Defendant Attorney

Triana, Jeremy, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing:

03/19/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Interrogatory

03/19/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Memorandum of Disposition

03/18/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Motion to Compel

05/02/2019 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Filing:

03/19/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

03/19/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Request for Production

03/19/2019 - Request for Production

Motion to Dismiss

04/01/2019 - Motion to Dismiss

Statement of Claim

01/24/2019 - Statement of Claim

Memorandum of Law

03/19/2019 - Memorandum of Law

Notice of Filing:

04/26/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Order on Motion to Compel

06/20/2019 - Order on Motion to Compel

Pretrial Catalog

03/19/2019 - Pretrial Catalog

Notice:

04/08/2019 - Notice:

Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet

01/24/2019 - Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet

Motion to Compel

05/02/2019 - Motion to Compel

Answer and Affirmative Defense

04/01/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Motion to Compel

05/02/2019 - Motion to Compel

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31522:4144; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: CAROL/BRITNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Cancellation Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: JUNE 19, 2019 @9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3560053AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:ARMANDO A BRANA 7315 SW 87TH AVE STE. # 300 MIAMI FL 33173-5473 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$175.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.