Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/27/2019 at 04:37:35 (UTC).

HEALTH CARE FAMILY REHABILITATION CENTER, CORP VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/05/2019 HEALTH CARE FAMILY REHABILITATION CENTER, CORP filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HEALTH CARE FAMILY REHABILITATION CENTER, CORP

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

SUAREZ, MARLENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Katiana B Fleites

Defendant Attorney

Showell, Erica A.

 

Court Documents

Objection:

05/02/2019 - Objection:

Order Extending Time for

04/08/2019 - Order Extending Time for

Motion for Extension of Time

03/14/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

02/12/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Email Notice with Party

02/06/2019 - Email Notice with Party

Statement of Claim

01/05/2019 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

01/11/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice of Taking Deposition

01/08/2019 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Request for Admissions

01/08/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Filing:

05/08/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Hearing-

05/07/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Taking Deposition

04/26/2019 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Order Extending Time for

04/08/2019 - Order Extending Time for

Letter of Correspondence

03/18/2019 - Letter of Correspondence

Memorandum of Disposition

02/12/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice of Filing:

02/12/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Interrogatory

01/08/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

01/08/2019 - Request for Production

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31463:1269; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Objection; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Protective Order; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Email Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3440048AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:KATIANA B FLEITES 1800 SW 27TH AVENUE, SUITE 500 MIAMI FL 33145 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$175.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEALTH CARE FAMILY REHABILITATION, CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katiana B Fleites