This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/07/2021 at 00:01:07 (UTC).

HARVEY RUVIN AS MIAMI-DADE CLERK OF THE COURTS VS ORLANDO ULLOA ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 HARVEY RUVIN AS MIAMI-DADE CLERK OF THE COURTS filed an Other lawsuit against ORLANDO ULLOA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harvey Ruvin as Miami-Dade Clerk of the Courts

Defendants

WCI Financial Corporation

MERS

AMERICAN MORTGAGE NETWORK OF FLORIDA

Citigroup, Inc.

CITIBANK, N,A,

Miramar Gardens Townhouses Homeowners Association

Palm Coast Recovery Corp.

Ulloa, Orlando

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.

Ocwen Financial Corporation

U S BANK NATL ASSN

GSAA HOME EQUITY TRUST 2007-3 ASSET -BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2007-3

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Millares, Rafael E.

Defendant Attorney

Paul M. Messina

 

Court Documents

Summary Final Judgment

09/28/2021 - Summary Final Judgment

Returned Mail

10/04/2021 - Returned Mail

Summary Final Judgment

09/28/2021 - Summary Final Judgment

Notice of Limited Appearance

09/27/2021 - Notice of Limited Appearance

Order:

08/18/2021 - Order:

Motion for Default

08/13/2021 - Motion for Default

Notice of Hrg Special Appt

07/19/2021 - Notice of Hrg Special Appt

Notice of Hrg Special Appt

07/16/2021 - Notice of Hrg Special Appt

Order of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record

07/09/2021 - Order of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record

Notice of Hearing-

07/08/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion to Withdraw

07/08/2021 - Motion to Withdraw

Motion:

07/07/2021 - Motion:

Notice of Filing:

06/30/2021 - Notice of Filing:

Motion for Summary Judgment

06/30/2021 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Summons Returned - No Service

05/28/2021 - Summons Returned - No Service

Service Returned

05/26/2021 - Service Returned

Answer and Affirmative Defense

05/12/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Answer and Affirmative Defense

05/12/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Court Registry Voucher Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Returned Mail; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORDER GRANTING MOTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summary Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summary Final Judgment; Book/Page: 32770:2777; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Ulloa Orlando; Ocwen Financial Corporation; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.; Miramar Gardens Townhouses Homeowners Association; WCI Financial Corporation; Palm Coast Recovery Corp.; Citigroup Inc.; MERS; AMERICAN MORTGAGE NETWORK OF FLORIDA; CITIBANK NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Limited Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR GSAA HOME EQUITY TRUST 2007-3, ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2007-3S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DISBURSING TAX SALE SURPLUS FUNDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2380009AMT PAID:$21,691.94 NAME:HARVEY RUVIN COMMENT:CT. ORDER ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3106-COURT REGISTRY DEP1 $21,691.94 $21,691.94 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$21,691.94 RECEIPT DATE:08/27/2021 REGISTER#:238CASHIER:BEBA1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTING MOTION TO RELEASE CLERK AND CONTINUE INTERPLEADER (TAX DEED SALE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (A) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (A) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (A) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (A) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (A) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2560006AMT PAID:$406.00 NAME:MILLARES, RAFAEL E. 6401 SW 87TH AVE STE 100 MIAMI FL 33173-2520 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 3102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$5.00$5.00 TENDER TYPE:EXEMPTTENDER AMT:$406.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/28/2020 REGISTER#:256CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Miramar Gardens Townhouses Homeowners Association is a litigant

Latest cases where PALM COAST RECOVERY CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN MORTGAGE NETWORK, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ocwen Financial Corporation is a litigant