This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/12/2021 at 08:38:33 (UTC).

HARVEY RUVIN AS MIAMI-DADE CLERK OF THE COURTS VS LEEWARD CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 HARVEY RUVIN AS MIAMI-DADE CLERK OF THE COURTS filed an Other lawsuit against LEEWARD CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harvey Ruvin as Miami-Dade Clerk of the Courts

Defendants

Leeward Condominium Association, Inc.

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee

Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc

Darvin Asset Recovery, LLC

LEEWARD CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC (THE)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Millares, Rafael E.

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/07/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/07/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/07/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/07/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/07/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/06/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/06/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/06/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/06/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/06/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Amended Complaint

10/06/2021 - Amended Complaint

Complaint

10/04/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/04/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2950116AMT PAID:$50.00 NAME:MILLARES, RAFAEL E. 6401 SW 87TH AVE STE 100 MIAMI FL 33173-2520 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:EXEMPTTENDER AMT:$50.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/08/2021 REGISTER#:295CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: Leeward Condominium Association Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: Leeward Condominium Association Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Darvin Asset Recovery LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040255AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:MILLARES, RAFAEL E. 6401 SW 87TH AVE STE 100 MIAMI FL 33173-2520 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:EXEMPTTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/06/2021 REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DARVIN ASSET RECOVERY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Millares, Rafael E.