This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/05/2022 at 19:39:54 (UTC).

HARVEY RUVIN AS MIAMI-DADE CLERK OF THE COURTS VS CEDAR GLENN CONDOMINIUM APTS., INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 HARVEY RUVIN AS MIAMI-DADE CLERK OF THE COURTS filed an Other lawsuit against CEDAR GLENN CONDOMINIUM APTS , INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harvey Ruvin as Miami-Dade Clerk of the Courts

Defendants

Cedar Glenn Condominium Apts., Inc.

Darvin Asset Recovery, LLC

Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.

AAMES Funding Corporation

Bank of New York Mellon (The)

Partners for Payment DE IV, LLC

Cedar Gleen Condominium Aprs., Inc

AAMES HOME LOAN

THE BANK OF NEW YORK

JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. as TR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Millares, Rafael E.

Defendant Attorney

Stevens, Adam Jeffrey

 

Court Documents

Order Setting CM Deadline

04/25/2022 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Order of Default

02/28/2022 - Order of Default

Motion for Default

02/28/2022 - Motion for Default

Motion for Default

02/28/2022 - Motion for Default

Notice of Default Not Entered

02/10/2022 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Notice of Default Not Entered

02/10/2022 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Motion for Default

02/08/2022 - Motion for Default

Motion for Default

02/08/2022 - Motion for Default

Service Returned

01/27/2022 - Service Returned

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/03/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/03/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/03/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/03/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/03/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/03/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/03/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

12/23/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/23/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: AGAINST PARTNERS FOR PAYMENT DE IV, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: AAMES Funding Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Partners for Payment DE IV LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Darvin Asset Recovery LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2910091AMT PAID:$403.50NAME:MILLARES, RAFAEL E.6401 SW 87TH AVE STE 100MIAMI FL 33173-2520COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$2.50$2.50TENDER TYPE:EXEMPTTENDER AMT:$403.50RECEIPT DATE:12/28/2021REGISTER#:291CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AAMES HOME LOAN DBA is a litigant

Latest cases where DARVIN ASSET RECOVERY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AAMES FUNDING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant