This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/01/2023 at 01:40:36 (UTC).

HARRY JEAN LOUIS VS CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 HARRY JEAN LOUIS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOUIS, HARRY JEAN

Defendant

CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Low, David

Canaura, Jose M

Defendant Attorney

Paez, Edward A., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Request for Production

08/12/2022 - Request for Production

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

08/12/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

08/12/2022 - Complaint

Request for Admissions

08/12/2022 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

08/12/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Voluntary Dismissal

06/20/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

05/31/2023 - Order of Dismissal

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

03/15/2023 - Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Notice:

03/15/2023 - Notice:

Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

02/28/2023 - Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

02/13/2023 - Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

AgreedOrder

02/01/2023 - AgreedOrder

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

01/30/2023 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Notice of Filing:

01/23/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Response to Request for Production

01/20/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

01/20/2023 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Unavailability/absence

01/13/2023 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

01/13/2023 - Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/20/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment; Comments: WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33763:180; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 33734:1371; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Deposition; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF SETTLEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Amended Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event; Comments: MONDAY, MAY 1ST, 2023 AT 1:00 PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT WITH INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
08/26/2022

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2022

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120189AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:LOW, DAVID2101 WEST COMMERICAL BLVD STE#2800FT LAUDERDALE FL 33309COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:08/26/2022REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090107AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:LOW, DAVID2101 WEST COMMERICAL BLVD STE#2800FT LAUDERDALE FL 33309COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:08/18/2022REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less