This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/07/2019 at 04:09:25 (UTC).

HARRIS, JONATHAN VS RIOS, JESSICA

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 HARRIS, JONATHAN filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against RIOS, JESSICA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Harris, Jonathan

Respondent

Rios, Jessica

Minor

Harris, Jonaliya Loren

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • Parenting Plan; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITHATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Certificate of Completion of Parenting Class; Event Type: Event; Comments: COPY-RESPONDENT'S Parties: Rios Jessica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Financial Affidavit; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Rios Jessica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Affidavit of Respondent Child Custody Jurisdiction; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Rios Jessica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Acknowledgment of Status Quo Temp Domestic Relations Order; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Request for Hearing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Rios Jessica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Rios Jessica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR HEARING FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Order Directing Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2019
  • Affidavit of Petitioner - Child Custody Jurisdiction; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Financial Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Harris Jonathan; Harris Jonaliya Loren

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Birth Certificate; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2210044AMT PAID:$351.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$301.00$301.00 3339-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3340-SHERIFF - DADE1$40.00$40.00 TENDER TYPE:CASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Filed at Courthouse Center; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Summons Issued; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less