This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/08/2021 at 03:46:45 (UTC).

HARBOUR CLUB VILLAS CONDOMINIUM CORPORATION INC VS CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 HARBOUR CLUB VILLAS CONDOMINIUM CORPORATION INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harbour Club Villas Condominium Corporation Inc

Defendants

Continental Insurance Company

CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chavin, Valorie S

 

Court Documents

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

07/28/2021 - Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Amended Complaint

07/16/2021 - Amended Complaint

Request for Production

06/25/2021 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

06/25/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Email Notice:

06/25/2021 - Email Notice:

Notice of Taking Deposition

06/25/2021 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Complaint

06/25/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/25/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/25/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/25/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Book/Page: 32648:2450; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2580308AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:CHAVIN, VALORIE S 12955 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 201 NORTH MIAMI FL 33181-2021 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/26/2021 REGISTER#:258CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2580302AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:CHAVIN, VALORIE S 12955 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 201 NORTH MIAMI FL 33181-2021 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/26/2021 REGISTER#:258CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: Continental Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PROPERTYSERVICE@CMSLAWGROUP.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Continental Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Continental Casualty Company is a litigant