This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/10/2021 at 09:43:23 (UTC).

HAMPSHIRE HOMES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. VS MACHIN, CHRISTOPHER S.

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 HAMPSHIRE HOMES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MACHIN, CHRISTOPHER S. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hampshire Homes Homeowners Association, Inc.

Defendants

Machin, Christopher S.

Cooper, Christina M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Iglesias, David D

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

09/07/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Service Return for Unknown Party

08/27/2021 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Return for Unknown Party

08/27/2021 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Returned

08/27/2021 - Service Returned

Service Returned

08/27/2021 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/30/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/30/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/30/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/30/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/28/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/28/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/28/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/28/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

07/28/2021 - Lis Pendens

Complaint

07/28/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/28/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32724:2135; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Machin Christopher S.; Cooper Christina M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION TWO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Cooper Christina M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Machin Christopher S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: Cooper Christina M.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Machin Christopher S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2990014AMT PAID:$45.00 NAME:IGLESIAS, DAVID D 1900 N COMMERCE PKWY WESTON FL 33326-3236 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$45.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/30/2021 REGISTER#:299CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3010165AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:IGLESIAS, DAVID D 1900 N COMMERCE PKWY WESTON FL 33326-3236 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/29/2021 REGISTER#:301CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32664:433; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HAMPSHIRE HOMES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Iglesias, David D