Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/16/2021 at 16:40:03 (UTC).

GULF COAST INJURY CENTER VS MERCURY INS CO OF FLA

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 GULF COAST INJURY CENTER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MERCURY INS CO OF FLA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gulf Coast Injury Center

Assignor

Estrada, Miguel

Defendant

Mercury Ins Co Of Fla

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dover, Jeremy Phillip

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Process

07/07/2021 - Notice of Service of Process

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/24/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/21/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Email Notice:

06/09/2021 - Email Notice:

Notice of Appearance

06/09/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

06/09/2021 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Notice of Interrogatory

06/09/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

06/09/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

06/09/2021 - Request for Admissions

Statement of Claim

06/09/2021 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/09/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: Mercury Ins Co Of Fla

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2620266AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:DOVER, JEREMY PHILLIP 3920 W. BROWARD BLVDSUITE B-1 FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33312 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/23/2021 REGISTER#:262CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2660521AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:DOVER, JEREMY PHILLIP 3920 W. BROWARD BLVDSUITE B-1 FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33312 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/10/2021 REGISTER#:266CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PIP-PLEADINGS@ATTORNEYSOFTHEINJURED.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $99.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gulf Coast Injury Center is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dover, Jeremy Phillip