This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/03/2021 at 19:02:10 (UTC).

GREISYS LEON VS ARY KRAU ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/05/2019 GREISYS LEON filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ARY KRAU. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEON, GREISYS

Defendants

GUIRIBITEY COSMETIC AND BEAUTY INSTITUTE INC

KRAU, ARY

CG COSMETIC SURGERY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andres I. Beregovich

Defendant Attorneys

Kubs Lalchandani

Ingle, Julia Michelle

 

Court Documents

Notice of Interrogatory

08/13/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

08/13/2021 - Request for Production

Subpoena

07/29/2021 - Subpoena

Response to Request for Production

06/16/2021 - Response to Request for Production

Motion for Extension of Time

05/13/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Request for Production

04/13/2021 - Request for Production

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/09/2021 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Production

04/09/2021 - Notice of Production

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

03/31/2021 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Motion to Dismiss

01/13/2020 - Motion to Dismiss

Order Extending Time for

10/30/2019 - Order Extending Time for

Notice of Appearance

10/28/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Interrogatory

10/05/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

10/05/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

10/05/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Production

10/05/2019 - Request for Production

Complaint

10/05/2019 - Complaint

Civil Cover

10/05/2019 - Civil Cover

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Subpoena; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Kubs Lalchandani; GUIRIBITEY COSMETIC AND BEAUTY INSTITUTE INC; CG COSMETIC SURGERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event; Comments: FIFTH REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO GUIRIBITEY COSMETIC & BEAUTY INSTITUTE, INC. D/B/A CG COSMETIC SURGERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Kubs Lalchandani; GUIRIBITEY COSMETIC AND BEAUTY INSTITUTE INC; CG COSMETIC SURGERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND INITIAL WRITTEN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Kubs Lalchandani; KRAU ARY; GUIRIBITEY COSMETIC AND BEAUTY INSTITUTE INC; CG COSMETIC SURGERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3550161AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:ANDRES I. BEREGOVICH 210 N MILLS AVE ORLANDO FL 32801-2114 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/08/2019 REGISTER#:355CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GUIRIBITEY COSMETIC AND BEAUTY INSTITUTE INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEREGOVICH ANDRES I