This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/13/2019 at 11:35:12 (UTC).

GREEN LEAF COMPANY INC. VS BRIO PROPERTIES LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 GREEN LEAF COMPANY INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BRIO PROPERTIES LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Green Leaf Company Inc.

Defendants

Modern Doral Community Association, Inc.

Onorato, Roberto

Brio Properties LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carrillo, Felix R

Defendant Attorneys

Hernandez, Alexis

Jason D Silver (esq)

Marcelo, Heidi

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover

07/03/2019 - Civil Cover

Complaint

07/03/2019 - Complaint

Certificate of Possession of Note

07/03/2019 - Certificate of Possession of Note

Lis Pendens

07/03/2019 - Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

07/03/2019 - Lis Pendens

Answer and Affirmative Defense

08/01/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Service Returned

08/05/2019 - Service Returned

Service Returned

08/05/2019 - Service Returned

Service Returned

08/05/2019 - Service Returned

Service Return for Unknown Party

08/05/2019 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Return for Unknown Party

08/05/2019 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Notice of Appearance

08/22/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

08/22/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order Extending Time for

09/06/2019 - Order Extending Time for

Order Extending Time for

09/06/2019 - Order Extending Time for

Notice of Appearance

09/06/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

09/06/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Marcelo Heidi; Brio Properties LLC; Onorato Roberto

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Marcelo Heidi; Brio Properties LLC; Onorato Roberto

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Jason D Silver (esq); Brio Properties LLC; Onorato Roberto

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Jason D Silver (esq); Brio Properties LLC; Onorato Roberto

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Hernandez Alexis; Modern Doral Community Association Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Brio Properties LLC; Onorato Roberto; Modern Doral Community Association Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2650022AMT PAID:$50.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE5$10.00$50.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$70.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/15/2019 REGISTER#:265CASHIER:KWILLI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3430046AMT PAID:$1,915.00 NAME:CARRILLO, FELIX R 3676 SW 2ND ST MIAMI FL 33135-1023 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1 $1,906.00 $1,906.00 3142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.00 3142-RECORDIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 31523:2005; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Possession of Note; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less