This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/16/2022 at 00:35:43 (UTC).

GRAYBAR ELECTRIC CO INC VS ACCESS BUILDERS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 GRAYBAR ELECTRIC CO INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ACCESS BUILDERS INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Graybar Electric Co Inc

Defendants

Access Builders Inc

Cancio, Edward P

Garnishee

Ocean Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Perry D Monioudis

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/06/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/06/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Satisfaction of Judgment

05/06/2022 - Satisfaction of Judgment

Satisfaction of Judgment

05/06/2022 - Satisfaction of Judgment

Final Judgment by Judge

04/25/2022 - Final Judgment by Judge

Stipulation

04/22/2022 - Stipulation

Writ of Garnishment Returned Executed

04/14/2022 - Writ of Garnishment Returned Executed

Notice:

04/13/2022 - Notice:

Answer of Garnishee

04/13/2022 - Answer of Garnishee

eWrit of Garnishment ISSUED

04/06/2022 - eWrit of Garnishment ISSUED

eWrit of Garnishment RECEIVED

04/05/2022 - eWrit of Garnishment RECEIVED

Motion for Garnishment

04/05/2022 - Motion for Garnishment

Order:

03/30/2022 - Order:

Motion to Strike

03/29/2022 - Motion to Strike

Order Vacating Default

03/21/2022 - Order Vacating Default

Final Judgment by Judge

03/14/2022 - Final Judgment by Judge

Certificate of Service

03/09/2022 - Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service

03/09/2022 - Certificate of Service

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Satisfaction of Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Satisfaction of Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 33156:1571; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Ocean Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Garnishment Returned Executed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO DFNT (GARNISHMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer of Garnishee; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070006AMT PAID:$85.00NAME:PERRY D MONIOUDIS100 S PINE ISLAND RD STE 202PLANTATION FL 33324-2664COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2134-WRIT (GARD) ADD FE1$85.00$85.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$85.00RECEIPT DATE:04/07/2022REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Garnishment Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: eWrit of Garnishment ISSUED; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 33. Parties: Ocean Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Cancio Edward P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Access Builders Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3220273AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:PERRY D MONIOUDIS100 S PINE ISLAND RD STE 202PLANTATION FL 33324-2664COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.002139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:12/09/2021REGISTER#:322CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3200395AMT PAID:$400.00NAME:PERRY D MONIOUDIS100 S PINE ISLAND RD STE 202PLANTATION FL 33324-2664COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$400.00$400.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$400.00RECEIPT DATE:12/07/2021REGISTER#:320CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: $16440.68

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OCEAN BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PERRY D MONIOUDIS