This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 04/30/2022 at 07:33:55 (UTC).

GRANADA INSURANCE COMPANY VS FRANKLIN SAIZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/25/2022 GRANADA INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FRANKLIN SAIZ. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRANADA INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

SAIZ, FRANKLIN

SAIZ KASSE, JOSE

TAMARES, ARIEL

LEE, TERRY

SINCLAIR, WINSTON

VALLE, MAYELIN

DEL CARMEN MARTI DIAZ, INDIANA

INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE

UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

COEGO-JORGE, YUNIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Bond Atkinson

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/01/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/01/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/01/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/01/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/01/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/01/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/01/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/01/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/01/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: VALLE MAYELIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SAIZ FRANKLIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SAIZ KASSE JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: COEGO-JORGE YUNIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: DEL CARMEN MARTI DIAZ INDIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040002AMT PAID:$125.00NAME:JOHN BOND ATKINSONATKINSON P A JOHN BOND ATKINSON 1 SE THIRD AVESUMIAMI FL 33131-1815COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$15.00$15.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$125.00RECEIPT DATE:04/02/2022REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 17. Parties: COEGO-JORGE YUNIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GRANADA INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where United Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant