This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 02/20/2022 at 11:50:26 (UTC).

GRANADA INSURANCE COMPANY VS EXECUTIVE DIAGNOSTIC CENTER A/A/O FELIX ALAYON

Case Summary

On 08/04/2020 GRANADA INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against EXECUTIVE DIAGNOSTIC CENTER A/A/O FELIX ALAYON. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-01

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Appellant

Granada Insurance Company

Appellee

Executive Diagnostic Center a/a/o Felix Alayon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Perez, Luis N

Appellee Attorney

Douglas Howard Stein

 

Court Documents

Appeal Transfer Form

01/11/2021 - Appeal Transfer Form

Notice:

12/17/2020 - Notice:

Order:

12/01/2020 - Order:

Appeal Index

12/01/2020 - Appeal Index

Supplemental Record on Appeal. Volume "Volume"

12/01/2020 - Supplemental Record on Appeal. Volume "Volume"

Appendix to Initial Brief

11/23/2020 - Appendix to Initial Brief

Appellant's Initial Brief

11/23/2020 - Appellant's Initial Brief

Response:

11/20/2020 - Response:

Notice of Filing:

11/20/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

11/20/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

11/20/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Directions to The Clerk

11/20/2020 - Directions to The Clerk

Order:

11/19/2020 - Order:

Motion:

11/19/2020 - Motion:

Motion to Supplement

11/19/2020 - Motion to Supplement

Order:

11/19/2020 - Order:

Notice of Filing:

11/16/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Motion to Supplement Record on Appeal

11/13/2020 - Motion to Supplement Record on Appeal

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Record on Appeal Returned to Lower Tribunal; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Appeal Transfer Form; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF AGREEMENT FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER BRIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 20-20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Appeal Index; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Granada Insurance Company; Executive Diagnostic Center a/a/o Felix Alayon

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Supplemental Record on Appeal. Volume "Volume"; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Supplemental Record Due; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Supplement Completed; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Appendix to Initial Brief; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Appellant's Initial Brief; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Appeal Index; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Granada Insurance Company; Executive Diagnostic Center a/a/o Felix Alayon

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Record on Appeal.; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Record Completed; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DISCHARGE OF SHOW CAUSE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY APPEAL SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE INITIAL BRIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time for Initial Brief; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order to Show Cause; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Acknowledgement Letter Mailed to Parties; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Dade County Courthouse; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appeal filed; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less