This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 02/13/2023 at 13:16:31 (UTC).

GRACIELA ROIG VS CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 GRACIELA ROIG filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROIG, GRACIELA

Defendant

CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Low, David

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/29/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

11/29/2022 - Complaint

Request for Admissions

11/29/2022 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

11/29/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

11/29/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/30/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/01/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

12/05/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Appearance

12/27/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

12/27/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Taking Deposition

01/03/2023 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

01/03/2023 - Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

Order Extending Time for

01/10/2023 - Order Extending Time for

Motion for Extension of Time

01/19/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: CITIZENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080134AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:LOW, DAVID2101 WEST COMMERICAL BLVD STE#2800FT LAUDERDALE FL 33309COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:12/02/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160016AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:LOW, DAVID2101 WEST COMMERICAL BLVD STE#2800FT LAUDERDALE FL 33309COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:12/01/2022REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less