This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/05/2019 at 01:05:57 (UTC).

GOTHAM COLLECTION SERVICES CORP VS ADALGISA GUERRERO CAMARAA ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 GOTHAM COLLECTION SERVICES CORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ADALGISA GUERRERO CAMARAA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-05

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOTHAM COLLECTION SERVICES CORP

Defendants

FRAZER ALM, DAYROD

GUERRERO CAMARAA, ADALGISA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amanda R Duffy (esq)

 

Court Documents

Complaint

09/18/2019 - Complaint

Service Returned

10/03/2019 - Service Returned

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2130039AMT PAID:$20.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE2$10.00$20.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/25/2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GUERRERO CAMARAA ADALGISA; FRAZER ALM DAYROD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3490198AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:AMANDA R DUFFY (ESQ) PO BOX 290335 TAMPA FL 33687-0335 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.