This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 02/28/2020 at 22:16:49 (UTC).

GONZALEZ'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC VS GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/04/2019 GONZALEZ'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Assignee

Gutierrez, Yahayra

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yulexy Solis Garcia

Defendant Attorneys

Vazquez, Daniel, ESQ

Torres, Rosario L., ESQ

Torres, Rosario L.

 

Court Documents

Response to Request for Production

01/16/2020 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

01/16/2020 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Answer and Affirmative Defense

06/26/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Appearance

06/06/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

04/08/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Memorandum of Disposition

04/08/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice of Service of Process

04/05/2019 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Interrogatory

03/27/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

03/27/2019 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

03/27/2019 - Request for Production

Notice of Appearance

03/27/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Pre Trial Summons

02/19/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Request for Production

02/04/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

02/04/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice:

02/04/2019 - Notice:

Notice:

02/04/2019 - Notice:

Statement of Claim

02/04/2019 - Statement of Claim

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-7 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event; Comments: & STIPULATED WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3180002AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/20/2019 REGISTER#:318CASHIER:DAVERNF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3480143AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:YULEXY SOLIS GARCIA ANDREU, PALMA, LAVIN & SOLIS PLLC 815 NW 57 AVENUE MIAMI FL 33126 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.