This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/26/2019 at 06:12:56 (UTC).

GONZALEZ'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/01/2019 GONZALEZ'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

Gonzalez, Dasia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yulexy Solis Garcia

Defendant Attorney

Barrangan, Arlene

 

Court Documents

Motion for Extension of Time

04/23/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Answer

04/15/2019 - Answer

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

04/08/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Memorandum of Disposition

04/08/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice of Service of Process

04/05/2019 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Interrogatory

03/26/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

03/26/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

03/26/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Appearance

03/26/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Pre Trial Summons

02/15/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Request for Production

02/01/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

02/01/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

02/01/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

02/01/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Statement of Claim

02/01/2019 - Statement of Claim

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event; Comments: & STIPULATED WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3180001AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/20/2019 REGISTER#:318CASHIER:DAVERNF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3480089AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:YULEXY SOLIS GARCIA ANDREU, PALMA, LAVIN & SOLIS PLLC 815 NW 57 AVENUE MIAMI FL 33126 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 2,50000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less