This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/26/2022 at 08:25:43 (UTC).

GONZALEZ, RAUL VS MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH INCORPORATED

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 GONZALEZ, RAUL filed a Probate - Trust lawsuit against MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER SMITH INCORPORATED. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-02

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gonzalez, Raul

Defendant

Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated

Interested Party

Rodriguez, Jose Raul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Hernandez, Alexander J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

01/14/2022 - Complaint

Notice of Related Cases

01/14/2022 - Notice of Related Cases

(M) ESummons (Sub) Received

01/26/2022 - (M) ESummons (Sub) Received

(M) ESummons (Sub) Received

01/26/2022 - (M) ESummons (Sub) Received

ESummons Issued

01/27/2022 - ESummons Issued

ESummons Issued

01/27/2022 - ESummons Issued

Affidavit of Service

02/17/2022 - Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service

02/17/2022 - Affidavit of Service

Petition for Extension of Time

02/25/2022 - Petition for Extension of Time

Unsigned Order

02/25/2022 - Unsigned Order

Motion for Default and Default

03/07/2022 - Motion for Default and Default

Stipulation for Dismissal

03/08/2022 - Stipulation for Dismissal

Non-Military Affidavit

03/15/2022 - Non-Military Affidavit

Order:

03/16/2022 - Order:

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON JOSE R. RODRIGUEZ'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME(TIL 3-28-22) TO HIRE NEW COUNSEL(DE#13)NUNC PRO TUNC FR:2-25-22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation for Dismissal; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default and Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Unsigned Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: BLANK ORDER ORDER TO EXT TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM JOSE RAUL RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020008AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:HERNANDEZ, ALEXANDER J.2655 S LE JEUNE RD STE 1008CORAL GABLES FL 33134-6010COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3339-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003339-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:01/28/2022REGISTER#:302CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: Rodriguez Jose Raul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) ESummons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) ESummons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3000005AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:HERNANDEZ, ALEXANDER J.2655 S LE JEUNE RD STE 1008CORAL GABLES FL 33134-6010COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3400-PROBATE CP FILING1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:01/19/2022REGISTER#:300CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event; Comments: 2020-4143 CP 05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT OF REVOCATION OF TOTTEN TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition for Adv. Proceedings; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Cover Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hernandez, Alexander J.