This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/01/2020 at 22:08:47 (UTC).

GONZALEZ, JACQUELINE VS PARADA, ARNOLD

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 GONZALEZ, JACQUELINE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PARADA, ARNOLD. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gonzalez, Jacqueline

Respondent

Parada, Arnold

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketOrder of Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketMotion for Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: FORWARD TO THE JUDGE BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketAffidavit of Search Inquiry on Relatives of the Spouse; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITH LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketAffidavit of Diligent Search; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Action - Publication; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketSummons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Parada Arnold

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketSummons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Parada Arnold

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Status Quo Temp Domestic Relations Order; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketAcknowledgement of Receipt; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketPetition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketRequired Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketIndex of Forms; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2790020AMT PAID:$459.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 3339-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3340-SHERIFF - DADE1$40.00$40.00 TENDER TYPE:CASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketFiled at South Dade; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.