This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/21/2022 at 12:13:01 (UTC).

GONZALEZ FERNANDEZ, RAMON VS GUICHARDO DE GONZALEZ, CARLA MARIA

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 GONZALEZ FERNANDEZ, RAMON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GUICHARDO DE GONZALEZ, CARLA MARIA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GONZALEZ FERNANDEZ, RAMON

Respondent

GUICHARDO DE GONZALEZ, CARLA MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Funes, Alejandro D.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover

11/16/2021 - Civil Cover

Required Information Sheet

11/16/2021 - Required Information Sheet

Affidavit of Diligent Search

11/16/2021 - Affidavit of Diligent Search

Affidavit of:

11/16/2021 - Affidavit of:

Copy of:

11/16/2021 - Copy of:

Petition

11/16/2021 - Petition

Application/ Aff for Determination of Civil Indigent Status

11/16/2021 - Application/ Aff for Determination of Civil Indigent Status

Notice of Action - Publication

11/30/2021 - Notice of Action - Publication

Notice of Action - Publication

12/02/2021 - Notice of Action - Publication

Proof of Publication

01/05/2022 - Proof of Publication

Motion for Default

01/20/2022 - Motion for Default

Order to File

01/20/2022 - Order to File

Motion for Extension of Time

02/28/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order:

03/02/2022 - Order:

Affidavit of Diligent Search

05/06/2022 - Affidavit of Diligent Search

Order of Default

05/11/2022 - Order of Default

EFinal Judgment by Judge

05/16/2022 - EFinal Judgment by Judge

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: EFinal Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 33189:1500; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Diligent Search; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON MTN. FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order to File; Event Type: Event; Comments: AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF DELIGENT SEARCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: PETITIONER'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Proof of Publication; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Action - Publication; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Action - Publication; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3050070AMT PAID:$409.00NAME:FUNES, ALEJANDRO D.THE FUNES LAW FIRM PA 2857 SW 27TH AVENUECOCONUT GROVE FL 33133COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00TENDER TYPE:INDIGENTTENDER AMT:$409.00RECEIPT DATE:11/17/2021REGISTER#:305CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Application/ Aff for Determination of Civil Indigent Status; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Copy of:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Diligent Search; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Funes, Alejandro D.