This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/10/2022 at 04:51:48 (UTC).

GOLDEN WEST CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC VS OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/03/2022 GOLDEN WEST CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Golden West Condominium Association Inc

Defendant

Old Republic Union Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Balint, Stephanie A.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/03/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

03/03/2022 - Complaint

Email Notice:

03/03/2022 - Email Notice:

Request for Admissions

03/03/2022 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

03/03/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

03/03/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

03/04/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/10/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Motion for Default

05/17/2022 - Motion for Default

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: Old Republic Union Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2960018AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:BALINT, STEPHANIE A.200 SE 1ST ST STE 708MIAMI FL 33131-1909COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:03/10/2022REGISTER#:296CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3030094AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:BALINT, STEPHANIE A.200 SE 1ST ST STE 708MIAMI FL 33131-1909COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:03/05/2022REGISTER#:303CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: SB@HOME-LEGAL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Balint, Stephanie A