This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/29/2019 at 17:18:09 (UTC).

GOLDCOAST CHIROPRACTIC VS LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/21/2019 GOLDCOAST CHIROPRACTIC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Goldcoast Chiropractic

Assignor

Testa, Michelle

Defendant

LM General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thayer Musa

Defendant Attorney

Prado, Nicholas

 

Court Documents

Notice of Unavailability/absence

06/11/2019 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Email Notice:

03/26/2019 - Email Notice:

Notice of Appearance

03/26/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Answer

03/26/2019 - Answer

Response to Request for Admissions

03/19/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Production

03/19/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

03/19/2019 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Memorandum of Disposition

03/11/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

03/08/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Service Returned

02/13/2019 - Service Returned

Pre Trial Summons

01/29/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

01/21/2019 - Statement of Claim

Request for Admissions

01/21/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

01/21/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Email Notice:

01/21/2019 - Email Notice:

Request for Production

01/21/2019 - Request for Production

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM 12/02/2019 THRU 12/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Email Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2180019AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$530.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/29/2019 REGISTER#:218CASHIER:MONICAA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: LM General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3580096AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:THAYER MUSA 9008 SW 152ND ST PALMETTO BAY FL 33157 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECEIPT DATE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Email Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.