This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/27/2019 at 22:12:59 (UTC).

GOLDCOAST CHIROPRACTIC CENTER, P.A. VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 GOLDCOAST CHIROPRACTIC CENTER, P A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLDCOAST CHIROPRACTIC CENTER, P.A.

Assignor

YARALI, MELISSA

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sorensen, Jon

Defendant Attorney

Cabrera, Cristina M.

 

Court Documents

Motion for Attorneys Fees

02/14/2019 - Motion for Attorneys Fees

Notice of Appearance

03/05/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Statement of Claim

01/10/2019 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

01/24/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Request for Production

01/10/2019 - Request for Production

Email Notice:

01/10/2019 - Email Notice:

Request for Admissions

01/10/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

01/10/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Motion for Protective Order

04/17/2019 - Motion for Protective Order

Memorandum of Disposition

03/18/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice:

03/27/2019 - Notice:

Order of Recusal

03/15/2019 - Order of Recusal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Protective Order; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Recusal; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Attorneys Fees; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2770005AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$60.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/24/2019 REGISTER#:277CASHIER:MONICAA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3480026AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:SORENSEN, JON 815 N HOMESTEAD BLVD, #511 HOMESTEAD FL 33030 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Email Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.