This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/01/2023 at 13:48:09 (UTC).

GLOBAL LAW GROUP CORP. ET AL VS GLOBAL LAW GROUP AND ASSOCIATES CORP. ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 GLOBAL LAW GROUP CORP filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against GLOBAL LAW GROUP AND ASSOCIATES CORP. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Global Law Group Corp.

Carrazana, Esq., Christian

Defendants

Global Law Group and Associates Corp.

Camejo Argudin, Vanessa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sorensen, Jon

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/25/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/25/2023 - Complaint

Notice of Appearance

01/27/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice:

01/26/2023 - Notice:

Notice:

01/30/2023 - Notice:

Response:

01/31/2023 - Response:

Notice of Hearing-

03/06/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Unavailability/absence

03/06/2023 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Notice of Hrg Special Appt

03/31/2023 - Notice of Hrg Special Appt

Notice of Hearing-

03/31/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Filing:

04/18/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Memorandum

04/19/2023 - Memorandum

Order:

04/21/2023 - Order:

Order Setting CM Deadline

04/29/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Motion for Leave

05/31/2023 - Motion for Leave

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Leave; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO AMEND COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 4:00PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum; Event Type: Event; Comments: IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS' AMENDED PETITION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: AMENDED VERFIFIED EMERGENCY PETITION FOR MANDATORY AND PROHIBITORY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFFS EMAIL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS RESPONSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 04-19-2023 AT 4:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event; Comments: 19TH DAY OF APRIL 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: MARCH 22, 2023 AT 1:00P.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response:; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED VERIFIED EMERGENCY PETITION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF SUPPLEMENTAL CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO FLA. CIV. P. 1.610

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: AMENDED VERIFIED EMERGENCY PETITION FOR MANDATORYAND PROHIBITORY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070154AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:SORENSEN, JON815 N. HOMESTEAD BLVD., #511HOMESTEAD FL 33030COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:01/26/2023REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less