This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/08/2020 at 01:44:04 (UTC).

GLOBAL BENEFITS GROUP, INC. VS INTERNATIONAL BENEFIT UNDERWRITERS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 GLOBAL BENEFITS GROUP, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against INTERNATIONAL BENEFIT UNDERWRITERS LLC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GLOBAL BENEFITS GROUP, INC.

Defendants

INTERNATIONAL BENEFIT UNDERWRITERS LLC

ZUTLER, ADAM B.

ZUTLER, GREGG P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph R Englander

Luis S Konski

Defendant Attorney

Sardinha, Frank

 

Court Documents

Request:

06/30/2020 - Request:

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

06/25/2020 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Notice of Hearing-

06/09/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion to Compel

06/05/2020 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

06/02/2020 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Order on Motion to Compel

06/01/2020 - Order on Motion to Compel

AgreedOrder

03/25/2020 - AgreedOrder

Notice of Hearing-

02/14/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Filing:

02/05/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Receipt for Certified or Registered Mail Served

01/15/2020 - Receipt for Certified or Registered Mail Served

Receipt for Certified or Registered Mail Served

01/15/2020 - Receipt for Certified or Registered Mail Served

Service Returned

12/23/2019 - Service Returned

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

12/17/2019 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Response:

12/12/2019 - Response:

Notice of Filing:

12/12/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Service Returned

12/12/2019 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/21/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Complaint

11/18/2019 - Complaint

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 11:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON PLTFS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES AGAINST DEFENDANTS ADAM ZUTLER AND INTERNATIONAL BENEFIT UNDERWRITERS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ZUTLER ADAM B.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3450077AMT PAID:$30.00 NAME:JOSEPH R ENGLANDER 2 S BISCAYNE BLVD STE 3700 MIAMI FL 33131-1818 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3600322AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:JOSEPH R ENGLANDER 2 S BISCAYNE BLVD STE 3700 MIAMI FL 33131-1818 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.