This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/25/2020 at 12:01:16 (UTC).

GLENDA MATT (PR OF THE ESTATE OF ) VS DAVID M LIPMAN PA ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 GLENDA MATT PR OF THE ESTATE OF filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against DAVID M LIPMAN PA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matt (PR Of The Estate Of ), Glenda

Defendants

David M Lipman PA

Lipman, David M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Warren R Trazenfeld

Defendant Attorney

Peter W Homer

 

Court Documents

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

06/08/2020 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Order:

06/08/2020 - Order:

Order:

06/08/2020 - Order:

Order Extending Time for

04/16/2020 - Order Extending Time for

Order Extending Time for

03/19/2020 - Order Extending Time for

Notice of Appearance

03/18/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

03/18/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Case Manager Email

03/10/2020 - Case Manager Email

Service Returned

03/02/2020 - Service Returned

Service Returned

03/02/2020 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/19/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/19/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/18/2020 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/18/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

02/14/2020 - Complaint

Request for Production

02/14/2020 - Request for Production

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/14/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: REQUIRING COMPLIANCE WITH COMPLEX BUSINESS LITIGATION SECTION PROCEDURES AND ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON MOTIONS AND MEMO REQUIREMENTS AND MANDATORY ORDER TO CONFER AND CERTIFICATION REQUIREMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Peter W Homer; David M Lipman PA; Lipman David M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND INITIAL DISCOVERY PROPOUNDED WITH COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: AGREED-DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Peter W Homer; David M Lipman PA; Lipman David M

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Lipman David M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: David M Lipman PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3430154AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:WARREN R TRAZENFELD WARREN R. TRAZENFELD PA 9100 S. DADELAND BLVD SUIT MIAMI FL 33156 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.