This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 01/14/2022 at 16:00:23 (UTC).

GLADYS MIRANDA VS TAUBMAN COMPANY LLC (THE) ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 GLADYS MIRANDA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TAUBMAN COMPANY LLC THE. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miranda, Gladys

Defendants

Taubman Company LLC (The)

Federal Building Services, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lacayo, Gilberto E.

Defendant Attorneys

John P Keller

Healey, Katharine Tamara

 

Court Documents

Notice of Interrogatory

07/07/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/07/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Request for Admissions

07/07/2021 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

07/07/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Complaint

07/07/2021 - Complaint

Request for Production

07/07/2021 - Request for Production

Order Extending Time for

12/30/2021 - Order Extending Time for

Certificate of No Objections to Production

12/21/2021 - Certificate of No Objections to Production

AgreedOrder

12/14/2021 - AgreedOrder

Order Extending Time for

12/14/2021 - Order Extending Time for

Notice of Production

12/02/2021 - Notice of Production

Order Setting Jury Trial with Mediation Referral

11/16/2021 - Order Setting Jury Trial with Mediation Referral

Motion for Extension of Time

11/02/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

09/29/2021 - Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

Stipulation and Order Substituting Counsel

09/24/2021 - Stipulation and Order Substituting Counsel

Notice of Appearance

09/24/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Letter of Correspondence

09/24/2021 - Letter of Correspondence

Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

09/24/2021 - Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Calendar Call; Hearing Code: CALND; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Calendar Call; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of No Objections to Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON DEFENDANTSMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: (AGREED) PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting Jury Trial with Mediation Referral; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Taubman Company LLC (The)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Healey Katharine Tamara; Taubman Company LLC (The); Federal Building Services INC

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040073AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:LACAYO, GILBERTO E.1000 NW 57TH COURT SUITE 250MIAMI FL 33126COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:07/17/2021REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040275AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:LACAYO, GILBERTO E.1000 NW 57TH COURT SUITE 250MIAMI FL 33126COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:07/08/2021REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE TAUBMAN COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEALEY , KATHARINE TAMARA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John P Keller