This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 10/19/2022 at 04:22:30 (UTC).

GERTRUDIS T THOMAS VS AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/08/2022 GERTRUDIS T THOMAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AMAZON COM SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas, Gertrudis T

Defendants

Amazon.com Services LLC

Saber Logistics LLC

Paredes, Albert Lenin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aguirre, Jose E.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

08/08/2022 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

08/08/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Request for Production

10/11/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

10/11/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Answer and Affirmative Defense

09/26/2022 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

09/21/2022 - Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Interrogatory

09/20/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

09/20/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Appearance

09/13/2022 - Notice of Appearance

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/19/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/19/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/19/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Request for Admissions

08/09/2022 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

08/09/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

08/09/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

08/09/2022 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

08/09/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

08/09/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: Saber Logistics LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aguirre, Jose E.