This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/09/2021 at 01:02:33 (UTC).

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY VS JORGE GUZMAN DUENAS ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JORGE GUZMAN DUENAS. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEICO Indemnity Company

Defendants

Guzman Duenas, Jorge

Valdivia Barbosa, Ana Tatiana

Not Classified By Court

Ochoa Ruiz, Leonardo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer L Reiss

 

Court Documents

Service Returned

08/04/2021 - Service Returned

Service Returned

08/04/2021 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/21/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/21/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/16/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/16/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Email Notice:

07/16/2021 - Email Notice:

Complaint

07/16/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/16/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Guzman Duenas Jorge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Valdivia Barbosa Ana Tatiana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: GEICO Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: GEICO Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2950167AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:JENNIFER L REISS PO BOX 550858 JACKSONVILLE FL 32255-0858 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/20/2021 REGISTER#:295CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2950164AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:JENNIFER L REISS PO BOX 550858 JACKSONVILLE FL 32255-0858 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/20/2021 REGISTER#:295CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040269AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:JENNIFER L REISS PO BOX 550858 JACKSONVILLE FL 32255-0858 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/17/2021 REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: LITIGATION@HIDAYRICKE.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REISS JENNIFER L