This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/11/2021 at 06:23:00 (UTC).

GEICO GEN INS CO VS JESSE GARCIA ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 GEICO GEN INS CO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JESSE GARCIA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Geico Gen Ins Co

Defendants

Garcia, Jesse

Wismettac Asian Food Inc

Not Classified By Court

Gonzalez-Cayon, Ana B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer L Reiss

 

Court Documents

Service Returned

04/20/2021 - Service Returned

Service Returned

04/15/2021 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/12/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/12/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/12/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

04/12/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Email Notice:

04/08/2021 - Email Notice:

Complaint

04/08/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/08/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2560076AMT PAID:$20.00 NAME:JENNIFER L REISS PO BOX 550858 JACKSONVILLE FL 32255-0858 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$20.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/13/2021 REGISTER#:256CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Wismettac Asian Food Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Garcia Jesse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2760122AMT PAID:$400.00 NAME:JENNIFER L REISS PO BOX 550858 JACKSONVILLE FL 32255-0858 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$400.00$400.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$400.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/09/2021 REGISTER#:276CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: LITIGATION@HIDAYRICKE.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: $16450.26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Geico Gen Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases where WISMETTAC ASIAN FOODS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REISS JENNIFER L