Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/08/2021 at 16:47:07 (UTC).

GARRETT R. WEINSTEIN, D.C. P.A., VS QUENCH USA, INC

Case Summary

On 02/15/2021 GARRETT R WEINSTEIN, D C P A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against QUENCH USA, INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARRETT R. WEINSTEIN, D.C. P.A.,

CHIROPRACTIC CLINICS OF SOUTH FLORIDA

Defendant

QUENCH USA, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alexis E Altman

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing:

03/04/2021 - Notice of Filing:

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/23/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/18/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

02/15/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/15/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: QUENCH USA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2550247AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:ALEXIS E ALTMAN 757 NW 27TH AVE FL 3 MIAMI FL 33125-3012 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/20/2021 REGISTER#:255CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2570031AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:ALEXIS E ALTMAN 757 NW 27TH AVE FL 3 MIAMI FL 33125-3012 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/18/2021 REGISTER#:257CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chiropractic Clinics of South Florida is a litigant

Latest cases where QUENCH USA INC FKA PURE HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexis E Altman